Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Murphy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1915BornCleveland
28 Feb 194226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
20 Apr 197660.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
20 Apr 197660.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
11 Jun 197660.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
20 Nov 197863.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jul 198267.0SucceededBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Jun 199074.9RetiredBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Apr 200791.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Murphy:
Bishop Michael Joseph Murphy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Erie

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015