Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Stephen Loverde

Bishop of Arlington, Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1940 BornFramingham
18 Dec 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
3 Feb 198847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
3 Feb 198847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Octabia
12 Apr 198847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octabia
11 Nov 199353.1AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
17 Jan 199453.3InstalledBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
25 Jan 199958.3AppointedBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
25 Mar 199958.5InstalledBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Stephen Loverde:
Bishop Paul Stephen Loverde (born ) Bishop of Arlington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arlington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,623

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015