Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Joseph Povish

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lansing, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1924BornAlpena, MI
3 Jun 195026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
28 Jul 197046.3AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
29 Sep 197046.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
8 Oct 197551.5AppointedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
11 Dec 197551.6InstalledBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
7 Nov 199571.6RetiredBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
5 Sep 200379.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lansing, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Joseph Povish:
Bishop Kenneth Joseph Povish (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lansing

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Aug 2014