Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Charleston

Dioecesis Carolopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 July 1820
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Atlanta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: South Carolina
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 80,401 (31,055 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the State of South Carolina.
  • Conference Region: XIV (FL, GA, NC, SC)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CHR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-doc.org/
  • Mailing Address: 119 Broad St., P.O. Box 818, Charleston, SC 29402
  • Telephone: (843)853-2130
  • Fax: 724-6387

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 July 1820ErectedArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Charleston (erected)
3 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Charleston
Diocese of Mobile
Diocese of Savannah (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostDiocese of Charleston Vicariate Apostolic of North Carolina (erected)
10 February 1962Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Charleston (From Baltimore to Atlanta)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195017,5081,899,804.9%60411011734123042ap1951
195931,0182,370,0001.3%78561342319433557ap1960
196641,7042,450,0001.7%856515027810434463ap1967
197044,7512,669,0001.7%97591562868227865ap1971
197651,5612,784,0001.9%755412939927724895ap1977
198059,0272,876,0002.1%78571354371884272105ap1981
199078,7683,566,6502.2%76571335922886214112ap1991
1999121,6373,760,0003.2%9234126965632813785ap2000
2000126,7943,885,7363.3%10134135939696115485ap2001
2001130,2554,012,0123.2%10034134972706415191ap2002
2002130,6964,012,0123.3%89341231,0627070152117ap2003
2003148,1164,027,0123.7%102431451,02110386137117ap2004
2004152,4134,054,8903.8%108451539961006914393ap2005
2006157,3584,229,9903.7%96441401,123786413492ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014