Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Edmund F. McCaffrey

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina

Priest of Charleston, South Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1933BornSavannah, GA
2 Jul 195320.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 May 195926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Mar 197037.1SelectedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
23 Mar 197037.2ConfirmedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
3 Jun 197542.4ResignedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
1 Oct 199360.7IncardinatedPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
13 Nov 201683.8DiedPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmund F. McCaffrey
Abbot Edmund F. McCaffrey (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians

  • a priest for 57.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Nov 2016