Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Eric Guglielmone

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1945 Born
8 Apr 197832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
24 Jan 200963.0AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
25 Mar 200963.2Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Eric Guglielmone
Bishop Robert Eric Guglielmone (born ) Bishop of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Charleston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,078
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018