Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Leo Unterkoefler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Charleston, South Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1917BornPhiladelphia, PA
18 May 194426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
11 Dec 196144.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
11 Dec 196144.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Latopolis
22 Feb 196244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Latopolis
12 Dec 196447.3AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
22 Feb 199072.5ResignedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
4 Jan 199375.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Ernest Leo Unterkoefler:
Bishop Ernest Leo Unterkoefler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Charleston

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013