Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Howard Hodges

Deceased

Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1911BornHarpers Ferry, WV
8 Dec 193524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
8 Aug 195240.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
8 Aug 195240.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusadus
15 Oct 195241.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusadus
24 May 196149.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
17 Aug 196149.9InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
23 Nov 196251.1SucceededBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
27 Jan 198573.3DiedBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Howard Hodges:
Bishop Joseph Howard Hodges (born , died ) Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013