Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Francis Joseph Schlotterback, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keetmanshoop

Titular Bishop of Balanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1912BornPhiladelphia, PA, USA
17 Dec 193826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
24 Mar 195644.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
24 Mar 195644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Balanea
11 Jun 195644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balanea
2 Oct 198977.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
9 Dec 199482.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keetmanshoop, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Edward Francis Joseph Schlotterback:
Bishop Edward Francis Joseph Schlotterback O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keetmanshoop

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013