Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Minder, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1923Born
3 Jun 195026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
12 Oct 196743.9AppointedBishop of Keimoes, South Africa
10 Jan 196844.1Ordained BishopBishop of Keimoes, South Africa
5 Jul 200076.6RetiredBishop of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa
14 Aug 200985.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Minder
Bishop John Baptist Minder O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Keimoes-Upington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
Ordained PriestWilmington, Diocese of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast