Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Chiminello, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1938Born
27 Jun 196527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
28 May 199355.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
28 May 199355.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Numana
21 Aug 199355.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numana
14 Mar 199456.1AppointedBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
23 Nov 200264.8DiedBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Chiminello
Bishop Anthony Chiminello O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Keetmanshoop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Zeno di Cassola, Italy

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018