Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Keetmanshoop

Dioecesis Keetmanshoopensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philipp Pöllitzer, O.M.I., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 March 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Windhoek
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Namibia
  • Square Kilometers: 264,110 (102,012 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.pck.iway.na/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 88, 88 Cathedral Street, Keetmanshoop 9000, Namibia
  • Telephone: (063)222.007
  • Fax: 222.692

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Great Namaqualand
7 July 1909ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Orange River Prefecture Apostolic of Great Namaqualand (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Great Namaqualand
14 July 1930ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Great Namaqualand Vicariate Apostolic of Great Namaqualand
Vicariate Apostolic of Keetmanshoop
13 January 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Great Namaqualand Vicariate Apostolic of Keetmanshoop
Diocese of Keetmanshoop
14 March 1994ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Keetmanshoop Diocese of Keetmanshoop

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Keetmanshoop
19509,38558,00016.2%11920469236321ap1951
197018,01181,14422.2%26266923584ap1971
198024,100109,70022.0%125269267375922ap1981
199030,502162,00018.8%26261,1739355422ap1991
Diocese of Keetmanshoop
199935,847155,00023.1%117181,99112274821ap2000
200036,900158,00023.4%116172,17012235121ap2001
200137,600161,00023.4%15152,50612234721ap2002
200237,575161,00023.3%116172,21011254721ap2003
200337,973137,67527.6%219211,80811264821ap2004
200438,356137,67527.9%218201,91711234921ap2005
200640,000144,00027.8%216182,2229184721ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 May 2013