Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Klemann, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Namaqualand

Titular Bishop of Drusiliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1871BornHamburg, Germany
29 Jun 191241.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
24 Feb 193159.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
24 Feb 193159.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
19 Apr 193159.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
10 Nov 194271.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
21 Mar 196088.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Namaqualand, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Klemann:
Bishop Joseph Klemann O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Namaqualand

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013