Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Keimoes-Upington

Dioecesis Keimoesanus-Upingtonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Edward Gabriel Risi, O.M.I., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 8 February 1985
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bloemfontein
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 272,268 (105,163 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-keimoes.org.za/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 323, 4 Main Rd., Keimoes 8860, South Africa
  • Telephone: (054)461.1846
  • Fax: (086)751.1452

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Orange River
20 June 1885ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Orange River (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Orange River
2 May 1898ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Orange River Vicariate Apostolic of Orange River
7 July 1909Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Orange River Prefecture Apostolic of Great Namaqualand (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Keimoes
9 July 1940Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Orange River Vicariate Apostolic of Keimoes
Diocese of Keimoes
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Keimoes Diocese of Keimoes
Diocese of Keimoes-Upington
8 February 1985Name ChangedDiocese of Keimoes Diocese of Keimoes-Upington

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Keimoes
195015,913105,72515.1%2525636357ap1951
Diocese of Keimoes
197031,7513232992435220ap1971
198042,867363,06711.8%26261,648354620ap1981
Diocese of Keimoes-Upington
199054,869605,0309.1%320232,3853285321ap1991
199968,638317,34321.6%413174,0373164421ap2000
200069,633318,28821.9%616223,1653194121ap2001
200171,172322,17222.1%615213,3893184122ap2002
200253,464325,43716.4%814222,4303164123ap2003
200352,178325,43716.0%914232,2682234423ap2004
200460,501331,98418.2%814222,7502184323ap2005
200662,200336,00018.5%1016262,3922193126ap2007
201369,764387,58218.0%1312252,7901122325ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015