Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oudtshoorn

Dioecesis Oudtshoornensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 113,343 (43,778 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 42 St. Saviours Street, P.O. Box 97, Oudtshoorn 6620, South Africa
  • Telephone: (44)279.1715
  • Fax: 272.8908

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale}
3 August 1874ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale} (erected)
20 June 1885Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Orange River (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Oudtshoorn
13 June 1939Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Oudtshoorn
Vicariate Apostolic of Oudtshoorn
9 December 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Oudtshoorn Vicariate Apostolic of Oudtshoorn
Diocese of Oudtshoorn
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Oudtshoorn Diocese of Oudtshoorn

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Oudtshoorn
19503,780356,5411.1%3172018927109ap1951
Diocese of Oudtshoorn
197014,011600,0002.3%325285003111024ap1971
198012,639523,4402.4%12324526307525ap1981
199014,300553,0002.6%416207152244533ap1991
199922,522816,1672.8%714211,0723213417ap2000
200028,158856,9753.3%714211,3404223417ap2001
200124,774858,4762.9%814221,1264212717ap2002
200224,863944,3242.6%914231,0814192717ap2003
200325,088950,4002.6%1013231,0903171917ap2004
200426,344997,9202.6%109191,3865122217ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Mar 2013