Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfred Gottschalk, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1932Born
16 Jul 196028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
6 Mar 196937.1AppointedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
11 Jun 196937.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
20 Apr 198250.2DiedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Manfred Gottschalk
Bishop Manfred Gottschalk S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Oudtshoorn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreslavia

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018