Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Lück, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1909BornLangförden, Germany
11 Jul 193728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
13 Mar 194737.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aliwal, South Africa
13 Mar 194737.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Attuda
15 May 194738.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attuda
11 Jan 195141.7AppointedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
17 Dec 197364.6ResignedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
6 Oct 200091.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Lück:
Bishop Johannes Baptist Lück S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 53.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 42
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013