Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Lucas, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Scandinavia

Titular Archbishop of Adulis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1894Born
26 Oct 192430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
14 Sep 194550.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adulis
14 Sep 194550.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Southern Africa
29 Oct 194551.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adulis
3 Dec 195258.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to India
1 Jan 195762.2AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
16 Apr 195964.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Scandinavia
Oct 1961³66.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Scandinavia
3 Mar 196974.3DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Scandinavia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Lucas
Archbishop Martin Lucas S.V.D. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Scandinavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaarlem, Netherlands

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 62
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 11 Mar 2018