Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Boyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Johannesburg, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1897Born
24 Dec 192326.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 194850.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
9 Dec 194850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagai
2 Feb 194951.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagai
11 Jan 195153.0AppointedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
18 Jul 195456.5AppointedBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
24 Jan 197678.1RetiredBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
4 Dec 198688.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Johannesburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Hugh Boyle
Bishop Hugh Boyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Johannesburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunloy, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port Elizabeth, Vicariate Apostolic of Port Elizabeth

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1949, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 12 Aug 2020

Quantcast