Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Alphonse Omer Verstraete, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1924 BornOostrozebeke
19 Feb 195025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
9 Nov 196541.2AppointedPrefect of Western Transvaal, South Africa
27 Feb 197853.5AppointedBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa
14 May 197853.7Ordained BishopBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa
26 Mar 199469.6ResignedBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Daniel Alphonse Omer Verstraete:
Bishop Daniel Alphonse Omer Verstraete O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Klerksdorp.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015