Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Johannesburg

Archidioecesis Ioannesburgensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Buti Joseph Tlhagale, O.M.I., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 June 2007
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 14,517 (5,607 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-johannesburg.org.za/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.M.B. x10, Doornfontein 2028, South Africa
  • Telephone: (011)402-6400
  • Fax: 402-6406

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Transvaal
4 June 1886ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Transvaal (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Transvaal
16 September 1904ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Transvaal Vicariate Apostolic of Transvaal
22 December 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Transvaal Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale} (erected)
12 June 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Transvaal Prefecture Apostolic of Lydenburg (erected)
9 April 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Transvaal
Vicariate Apostolic of Pretoria (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Johannesburg
9 April 1948Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Transvaal Vicariate Apostolic of Johannesburg
Diocese of Johannesburg
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Johannesburg Diocese of Johannesburg
14 October 1965Territory LostDiocese of Johannesburg Prefecture Apostolic of Western Transvaal (erected)
Archdiocese of Johannesburg
5 June 2007ElevatedDiocese of Johannesburg Archdiocese of Johannesburg

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Johannesburg
195090,4592,024,8884.5%9879694247655ap1951
Diocese of Johannesburg
1970263,8123,500,0007.5%301401701,55121274940ap1971
1980336,6823,383,00010.0%321491811,8601221663100ap1981
1990589,0004,416,00013.3%341261603,68118176565100ap1991
1999700,0006,000,00011.7%471121594,40243158438104ap2000
2000700,0006,000,00011.7%471141614,34741160446104ap2001
2001700,0006,000,00011.7%481161644,26839166447104ap2002
2002700,0006,000,00011.7%461161624,32044167438104ap2003
2003700,0006,000,00011.7%461141604,37544165438104ap2004
2004700,0006,000,00011.7%491181674,19143173445104ap2005
2006704,0006,036,00011.7%491201694,16543176437104ap2007
Archdiocese of Johannesburg

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014