Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Brislin

Archbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1956 BornWelkom
19 Nov 198327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kroonstad, South Africa
17 Oct 200650.1AppointedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
28 Jan 200750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
18 Dec 200953.2AppointedArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Stephen Brislin:
Archbishop Stephen Brislin (born ) Archbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,327
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013