Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sylvester David, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Gunugus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1953 Born
4 Jan 198430.3EnteredMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Feb 198834.5Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Feb 199137.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Jun 201965.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
6 Jun 201965.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunugus

MicroData Summary for Sylvester David
Father Sylvester David O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurban, Archdiocese of Durban

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 Jun 2019

Quantcast