Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

Archidioecesis Civitatis Capitis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Brislin, Archbishop
  • Reginald Michael Cawcutt, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 30,372 (11,731 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-ct.org.za/
  • Mailing Address: Cathedral Place, 12 Bouquet Street, Cape Town 8001, South Africa
  • Telephone: (021)462.2417
  • Fax: 461.9330

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}
30 July 1847ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza} Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale} (erected)
3 August 1874Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Town
13 June 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Town
Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Cape Town Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
18 August 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad} Mission "Sui Iuris" of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Town
195033,464762,0004.4%4040804188241132ap1951
Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
195955,039913,9226.0%41499061110949335ap1960
197096,3431,120,5008.6%737114466913143149ap1971
1980141,7802,678,0005.3%61631241,14329741562ap1981
1990192,0002,304,0008.3%53591121,714498235267ap1991
1999191,9003,679,3755.2%65591241,547518524172ap2000
2000193,8103,734,5645.2%62601221,588519322969ap2001
2001196,7173,790,5815.2%59601191,653668021172ap2002
2002198,6843,846,4575.2%63621251,589628826072ap2003
2003200,6703,921,3975.1%68591271,580589326073ap2004
2004205,6793,539,3065.8%60601201,713579425272ap2005
2006213,6772,682,0008.0%63541171,826619421772ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 5 Mar 2014