Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Queenstown

Dioecesis Civitatis Reginae seu Queenstovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dabula Anthony Mpako, Bishop
  • Herbert Nikolaus Lenhof, S.A.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Queenstown
29 March 1938ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Queenstown Prefecture Apostolic of Queenstown
Vicariate Apostolic of Queenstown
9 April 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Queenstown Vicariate Apostolic of Queenstown
Diocese of Queenstown
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Queenstown Diocese of Queenstown

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Queenstown
196918,815906,9502.1%533384954814825ap1971
198034,6941,050,0003.3%3127585983498ap1981
199044,0001,235,0003.6%318212,09521935ap1991
199950,0001,650,0003.0%615212,38021860ap2000
200050,0001,800,0002.8%613192,63121663ap2001
200155,0001,900,0002.9%514192,89451658ap2002
200261,8862,110,0002.9%512173,64051432ap2003
200356,0002,110,0002.7%512173,29451428ap2004
200456,0002,110,0002.7%611173,29441228ap2005
201052,6002,278,0002.3%1112232,286101322ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013