Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Rosenthal, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1903BornOberveischede, Germany
2 Jul 192926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
9 Feb 194036.9AppointedPrefect of Queenstown, South Africa
9 Apr 194845.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Syedra
9 Apr 194845.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Queenstown, South Africa
23 May 194845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syedra
11 Jan 195147.8AppointedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
3 Feb 197268.9ResignedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
22 May 197572.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Queenstown, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Rosenthal:
Bishop John Baptist Rosenthal S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013