Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dabula Anthony Mpako

Archbishop of Pretoria, South Africa

Bishop of South Africa, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1959 Born
28 Jun 198626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pretoria, South Africa
23 May 201151.7AppointedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
6 Aug 201151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
30 Apr 201959.6AppointedBishop of South Africa, Military
30 Apr 201959.6AppointedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
22 Jun 201959.7InstalledArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Dabula Anthony Mpako
Archbishop Dabula Anthony Mpako (born ) Archbishop of Pretoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEastern Cape
Ordained BishopCathedral, Queenstown, Diocese of Queenstown

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pretoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Aug 2011
  • c3: CB, 7 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,123
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2019
  • i: CB, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 10 May 2019

Quantcast