Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Matthew Slattery, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1943 Born
21 Feb 197026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Nov 199350.1AppointedBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
19 Feb 199450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
23 Dec 201067.2AppointedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
23 Dec 201067.2AppointedBishop of South Africa, Military
30 Jan 201167.3InstalledArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
30 Apr 201975.6RetiredArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
30 Apr 201975.6RetiredBishop of South Africa, Military

MicroData Summary for William Matthew Slattery
Archbishop William Matthew Slattery O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortlaoise, Ireland
Ordained BishopKokstad, Diocese of Kokstad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pretoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,251
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 10 May 2019

Quantcast