Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mariannhill

Dioecesis Collis Mariae seu Mariannhillensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Durban
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 12,612 (4,871 Square Miles)
  • Description: comprise Districts of Ixopo, Impendle, Richmond, Umzinto, Umbumbulu, parts of Port Shepstone, Camperdown and Pinetown, Polela and Underberg
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 11001, Mariannhill 3601, Natal, South Africa
  • Telephone: (031)700-2704
  • Fax: 700-5600

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill
10 September 1921ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Vicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill (erected)
30 March 1930Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill Prefecture Apostolic of Umtata (erected)
8 April 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill Prefecture Apostolic of Mount Currie (erected)
Diocese of Mariannhill
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill Diocese of Mariannhill
21 February 1954Territory LostDiocese of Mariannhill Diocese of Umzimkulu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill
1949114,174500,00022.8%1073831,37518119642ap1951
Diocese of Mariannhill
1970191,820500,00038.4%870782,4591294701ap1971
1980258,960875,00029.6%964733,54711446543ap1981
1990306,3001,156,00026.5%1340535,77917643041ap1991
1999284,5001,390,00020.5%2829574,99116440043ap2000
2000264,9001,420,00018.7%2728554,81615940543ap2001
2001270,2001,450,00018.6%2830584,6586140043ap2002
2003281,6001,791,60015.7%3227594,7725534643ap2004
2004284,4001,819,40015.6%3724614,6625534643ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 16 Sep 2012