Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Streit, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mariannhill, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Maturba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1893Born
26 Jun 192632.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
23 Dec 195057.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mariannhill, South Africa
23 Dec 195057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicius
11 Jan 195157.0AppointedBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
3 Apr 195157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
5 Jul 195157.5InstalledBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
21 May 197076.4RetiredBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
21 May 197076.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
22 Jun 197076.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mariannhill, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Streit
Bishop Alphonse Streit C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mariannhill

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnterpleichfeld, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Mariannhill, Diocese of Mariannhill

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast