Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Grueter, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umtata, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1896Born
29 Jun 192730.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
3 Apr 194144.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Umtata, South Africa
3 Apr 194144.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
22 May 194144.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae
11 Jan 195154.1AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
26 Sep 196871.8ResignedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
26 Sep 196871.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammoniace
3 Mar 197174.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Ammoniace
2 Mar 197679.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Umtata, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph Grueter
Bishop Joseph Grueter C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umtata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuswil, Switzerland

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018