Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Delalle, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal

Titular Bishop of Thugga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1869BornArracourt, France
29 Jul 189424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Dec 190334.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
19 Dec 190334.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thugga
2 Jun 190434.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thugga
4 Apr 194676.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
15 Feb 194979.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Henri Delalle:
Bishop Henri Delalle O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013