Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-François Turinaz

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1838BornChambéry
20 Sep 186224.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 187334.9SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
21 Mar 187335.1ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
11 Jun 187335.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
23 Mar 188244.1SelectedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
30 Mar 188244.2ConfirmedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
1 Aug 191375.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
19 Oct 191880.7DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Turinaz:
Archbishop Charles-François Turinaz (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 401, and Page 535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013