Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Marie Bigex

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1751BornLa Balme-de-Thuy, France
23 Mar 177624.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181765.6SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
1 Oct 181765.8ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
23 Nov 181765.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
20 Mar 182472.2SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
24 May 182472.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
19 Feb 182775.2DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Bigex:
Archbishop François-Marie Bigex (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 147, and Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013