Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-François de Thiollaz

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1752BornChaumont-sur-Frangy
1 Jun 177624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Annecy, France
21 Apr 182270.0SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
27 Sep 182270.4ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
27 Apr 182371.0Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
14 Mar 183279.9DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-François de Thiollaz
Bishop Claude-François de Thiollaz (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016