Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Columbano Giovanni Battista Carlo Gaspare Chiaverotti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1754BornTorino
29 May 177925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Aug 181763.6SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
1 Oct 181763.7ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
23 Nov 181763.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
10 Oct 181864.8SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Dec 181865.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
6 Aug 183177.6DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Columbano Giovanni Battista Carlo Gaspare Chiaverotti:
Archbishop Columbano Giovanni Battista Carlo Gaspare Chiaverotti O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 225, and Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014