Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Lombard

Deceased

Bishop of Susa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1757BornAlessandria
10 Mar 178123.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 182466.6SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
24 May 182466.8ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
1 Aug 182467.0Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
9 Feb 183072.5DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vincenzo Lombard
Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Lombard (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016