Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amedeo Bruno di Samone

Deceased

Bishop of Cuneo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1754BornCuneo
19 Dec 178531.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181763.5SelectedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
1 Oct 181763.7ConfirmedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
5 Oct 181763.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
28 Dec 181763.9InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
21 Dec 183884.9DiedBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amedeo Bruno di Samone
Bishop Amedeo Bruno di Samone (born , died ) Bishop of Cuneo

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016