Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Galvano

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1800Born
24 May 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 183332.8SelectedBishop of Nice, France
30 Sep 183332.9ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
24 Nov 183333.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
17 Aug 185554.8DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique Galvano (VIAF: 95313752)
Bishop Dominique Galvano (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBibliana, Italy

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast