Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Cirio

Deceased

Bishop of Susa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1763BornCanelli
6 Jun 178926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
29 Oct 183168.7SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
24 Feb 183269.0ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
29 Apr 183269.2Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
3 Apr 183875.1DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Cirio
Bishop Pietro Antonio Cirio (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016