Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Maria Sappa de Milanes

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1758BornAlessandria
25 May 178223.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181759.0SelectedBishop of Acqui, Italy
1 Oct 181759.2ConfirmedBishop of Acqui, Italy
5 Oct 181759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
25 Dec 183476.4DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Maria Sappa de Milanes:
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Maria Sappa de Milanes (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013