Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Toppia

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1754Born
19 Sep 177824.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 181864.1SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
25 May 181864.3ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
2 Aug 181864.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 Jul 182874.4DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Toppia
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Toppia (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerletto

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast