Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Prin

Deceased

Bishop of Susa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1763BornSauze di Cesena
23 Sep 178623.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181754.3SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
1 Oct 181754.5ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
5 Oct 181754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
18 Nov 182259.6DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Prin:
Bishop Giuseppe Prin (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013