Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Sceberras Testaferrata

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1757BornValletta, Malta
180244.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 180245.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
21 Dec 180245.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berytus
20 Sep 180346.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
181557.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
8 Mar 181658.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Apr 181861.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
6 Apr 181861.0AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
6 Apr 181861.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 184386.3DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Sceberras Testaferrata:
Cardinal Fabrizio Sceberras Testaferrata (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
  • a cardinal for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 110, and Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013