Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef-Franz (Joseph Franšois Xavier) de Preux

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1740³BornSiders
17 Mar 176423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
22 Dec 176424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 May 180766.5SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
3 Aug 180766.7ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
8 Nov 180766.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 May 181776.4DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josef-Franz (Joseph Franšois Xavier) de Preux:
Bishop Josef-Franz (Joseph Franšois Xavier) de Preux (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1807, Number 17
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015