Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvator Ferro de Berardis

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1767Born
23 Apr 179124.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 181750.6SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
16 Mar 181850.9ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
23 Mar 181850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
15 Dec 181952.6DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvator Ferro de Berardis
Bishop Salvator Ferro de Berardis (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrapani

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,818, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast