Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Tobie Yenni

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne et Genève


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1774BornMorlon
23 Sep 179722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
10 Jul 181540.5AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
3 Sep 181540.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
8 Dec 184570.9DiedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Tobie Yenni:
Bishop Pierre-Tobie Yenni (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne et Genève

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 34
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015