Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Mossi de Morano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

Titular Archbishop of Side


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1752BornCasalen
1 Jun 177624.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179644.2AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
10 Jul 179644.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
29 May 180351.1ResignedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
26 Jun 180553.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
29 Jul 182977.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Mossi de Morano:
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Mossi de Morano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 345
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014