Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Madimetja Masela

Bishop of Polokwane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1958 BornBergzich
15 Dec 198426.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 201153.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Polokwane, South Africa
10 Jun 201354.9AppointedBishop of Polokwane, South Africa
7 Sep 201355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Polokwane, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Madimetja Masela:
Bishop Jeremiah Madimetja Masela (born ) Bishop of Polokwane

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Polokwane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015