Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Buti Joseph Tlhagale, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Johannesburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1947 BornRandfontein
196719.0ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 Aug 197628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Jan 199951.0AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
10 Apr 199951.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
8 Apr 200355.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Johannesburg, South Africa
29 Jun 200355.5InstalledBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
5 Jun 200759.4AppointedArchbishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
26 Apr 201365.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Klerksdorp, South Africa
25 Jan 201567.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Klerksdorp, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Buti Joseph Tlhagale
Archbishop Buti Joseph Tlhagale O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Johannesburg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Johannesburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,495
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016